EP0051213 - Homogeneous specific binding assay device, method for preparing it and analytical method using the device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.1988 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.03.1988 [1988/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MILES LABORATORIES, INC. 1127 Myrtle Street Elkhart Indiana 46514 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/19] | For all designated states MILES LABORATORIES, INC. 1127 Myrtle Street Elkhart Indiana 46514 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Greenquist, Alfred C. 54627 Andover Pl. Elkhart IN 46514 / US | 02 /
Li, Thomas M. 2914 Brooktree Ct. Elkhart, IN 46514 / US | 03 /
Rupchock, Patricia A. 3404 "E" Lane Apt. 3A Elkhart IN 46517 / US | 04 /
Tyhach, Richard Joseph 50966 George Dr. Elkhart, IN 46514 / US | 05 /
Walter, Bert 16881 Londonberry Lane South Bend, IN 46635 / US | [1982/19] | Representative(s) | Jesse, Ralf-Rüdiger, et al Bayer AG Konzernverwaltung RP Lizenzen und technische Kooperationen 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/29] | Jesse, Ralf-Rüdiger, Dr., et al Bayer AG Konzernverwaltung RP Lizenzen und technische Kooperationen D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [1982/19] | Senftl, Hannes, Dr. c/o Bayer AG Konzernverwaltung RP Patentabteilung D-5090 Leverkusen Bayerwerk / DE | Application number, filing date | 81108681.8 | 22.10.1981 | [1982/19] | Priority number, date | US19800202378 | 30.10.1980 Original published format: US 202378 | [1982/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0051213 | Date: | 12.05.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0051213 | Date: | 25.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/542 | [1987/13] | CPC: |
G01N33/542 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1982/19] | G01N33/54 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/19] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum homogenen spezifischen Bindungsassay, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und analytisches Verfahren zur Anwendung der Vorrichtung | [1982/19] | English: | Homogeneous specific binding assay device, method for preparing it and analytical method using the device | [1982/19] | French: | Dispositif d'essai des liaisons homogènes spécifiques, procédé pour sa préparation et méthode analytique faisant usage du dispositif | [1982/19] | Examination procedure | 22.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/19] | 05.01.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 29.08.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.09.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3641235 [ ] (WEISS MARGARET ROZMAN); | US4094647 [ ] (DEUTSCH MARSHALL E, et al); | DE2733380 [ ] (BEHRINGWERKE AG); | US4160008 [ ] (FENOCKETTI LEONARD P, et al); | US4168146 [ ] (GRUBB ANDERS O, et al); | GB1552607 [ ] (MILES LAB); | GB2023607 [ ] (MILES LAB); | EP0013156 [ ] (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]); | FR2458070 [ ] (COMPIEGNE INST TECHNOL SURF AC) | [ ] - Clinical Chemistry, Vol. 27, No. 9, September 1981 Easton, Pa, US R.J. TYHACH et al. "Adaptation of Prosthetic-Group-Label Homogeneous Immunoassay to Reagent strip Format", pages 1499-1504. * whole article * | [ ] - Clinical Chemistry, Vol. 25, No. 5 May 1979 Easton, Pa, US R.C. WONG et al. "Substrate-Labeled Fluorescent Immunoassay for Phenytoin in Human Serum", pages 686-690. * pages 686-690 * |