blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0053691

EP0053691 - Choke for high current transformers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.07.1985
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip31.07.1985No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.10.1985 [1985/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TRANSFORMATOREN UNION AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Deckerstrasse 1
D-7000 Stuttgart 50 / DE
[1983/28]
Former [1982/24]For all designated states
TRANSFORMATOREN UNION AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Deckerstrasse 1
D-7000 Stuttgart 50 / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Bartl, Karl
Dr. Wackerstrasse 25
D-8501 Schwanstetten 1 / DE
02 / Saemann, Karl
Hopfweg 13
D-8501 Pyrbaum / DE
[1982/24]
Representative(s)Mehl, Ernst, et al
Postfach 22 13 17
80503 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1982/24]Mehl, Ernst, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Postfach 22 13 17
D-80503 München / DE
Application number, filing date81108723.822.10.1981
[1982/24]
Priority number, dateDE1980304650510.12.1980         Original published format: DE 3046505
[1982/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0053691
Date:16.06.1982
Language:DE
[1982/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0053691
Date:26.09.1984
Language:DE
[1984/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.03.1982
ClassificationIPC:H01F27/26, H01F37/00, H02M7/04
[1982/24]
CPC:
H01F37/00 (EP); H01F27/263 (EP); H02M7/068 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   LI,   NL,   SE [1982/24]
TitleGerman:Saugdrossel für Hochstromtransformatoren[1982/24]
English:Choke for high current transformers[1982/24]
French:Réactance pour transformateurs à courant fort[1982/24]
File destroyed:20.04.2002
Examination procedure22.10.1981Examination requested  [1982/24]
15.07.1983Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.11.1983Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.12.1983Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
15.03.1984Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.03.1984Fee for grant paid
29.03.1984Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.06.1985No opposition filed within time limit [1985/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.10.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchDE143271  [ ];
 US2918616  [ ] (DIEBOLD EDWARD J);
 DE1199873  [ ] (MATERIEL ELECTRIQUE S W LE);
 US3275856  [ ] (CHUMAKOV WALTER V);
 DE1488222  [ ] (LICENTIA GMBH);
 DE2839114  [ ] (BLUM EISEN & METALLIND)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.