EP0056438 - Speed controlling device in multiple loop-controlled continuous mill trains [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/30] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weber, Roland Andreas-Paulus-Strasse 47 D-8521 Spardorf / DE | [1982/30] | Application number, filing date | 81108724.6 | 22.10.1981 | [1982/30] | Priority number, date | DE19813101512 | 19.01.1981 Original published format: DE 3101512 | [1982/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0056438 | Date: | 28.07.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0056438 | Date: | 31.08.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0056438 | Date: | 02.04.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G05D13/64, B21B37/04 | [1983/34] | CPC: |
B21B37/50 (EP);
B21B1/18 (EP);
B21B2013/006 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1982/30] | G05D13/64 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/30] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Drehzahlregelung in einer mehradrigen, schlingengeregelten Kontistrasse | [1982/30] | English: | Speed controlling device in multiple loop-controlled continuous mill trains | [1982/30] | French: | Régulateur de vitesse pour un train multiple continu à réglage par boucle | [1982/30] | Examination procedure | 22.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/30] | 30.08.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.09.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.01.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.10.1986 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1109121 | [AD] - SIEMENS-ZEITSCHRIFT; Nr. 47, 1973, Beiheft "Antriebstechnik und Proze~automatisierung in Hütten- und Walzwerken"; P. WALGENBACH "Elektrische Ausrüstung an Feinstahl- und Drahtstra~en", Seiten 115-119 | [A] - BROWN BOVERI MITTEILUNG Nr. 2/3, 1972, H. WALKNER "Digitale Sollwertvorgabe, Schlingenregelung und Folgesteuerung bei kontinuierlichen Walzstra~en" Seiten 109-112 |