EP0051216 - Vaccines for protecting cattle and sheep against bovine leukemia virus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/19] | Method of protecting cattle and sheep against bovine leukemia virus and vaccines for use therein | ||
[1984/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.1985 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1 Cyclotron Road Berkeley California 94720 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/19] | For all designated states THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA 1 Cyclotron Road Berkeley, California 94720 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Theilen, Gordon Henri, Dr. 882 Linden Lane Davis California 95616 / US | [1982/19] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/19] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81108740.2 | 22.10.1981 | [1982/19] | Priority number, date | US19800203062 | 03.11.1980 Original published format: US 203062 | [1982/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0051216 | Date: | 12.05.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0051216 | Date: | 01.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.1982 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, A61K39/12 | [1982/19] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
A61K39/0005 (EP,US);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
C12N2740/14022 (EP,US);
Y10S424/813 (EP,US);
Y10S424/814 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/22] |
Former [1982/19] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE | Title | German: | Impfstoffe zum Schutz der Rinder und Schafe gegen den Virus der Rinderleukämie | [1984/31] | English: | Vaccines for protecting cattle and sheep against bovine leukemia virus | [1984/31] | French: | Vaccins pour la protection des bovins et des ovins contre le virus de la leucémie des bovidés | [1984/31] |
Former [1982/19] | Verfahren zum Schutz der Rinder und Schafe gegen den Virus der Rinderleukämie und dabei zu verwendende Impfstoffe | ||
Former [1982/19] | Method of protecting cattle and sheep against bovine leukemia virus and vaccines for use therein | ||
Former [1982/19] | Méthode de protection des bovins et des ovins contre le virus de la leucémie des bovidés et vaccins à cet usage | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 15.06.1982 | Examination requested [1982/35] | 24.11.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.01.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 01.08.1984 | CH | 01.08.1984 | IT | 01.08.1984 | LI | 01.08.1984 | SE | 01.08.1984 | [2007/44] |
Former [1999/42] | BE | 01.08.1984 | |
CH | 01.08.1984 | ||
IT | 01.08.1984 | ||
LI | 01.08.1984 | ||
SE | 01.08.1984 | ||
Former [1986/12] | BE | 01.08.1984 | |
CH | 01.08.1984 | ||
LI | 01.08.1984 | ||
SE | 01.08.1984 | ||
Former [1985/16] | BE | 01.08.1984 | |
CH | 01.08.1984 | ||
LI | 01.08.1984 | ||
Former [1985/01] | CH | 01.08.1984 | |
LI | 01.08.1984 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]AU511417 ; | [A]US4034081 (JARRETT WILLIAM FLEMING HOGGAN, et al); | [A]US4117112 (JARRETT WILLIAM FLEMING HOGGAN, et al) |