Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE13093T | 15.05.1985 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP81108787 | 23.10.1981 | DE3043900 | 21.11.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0052773 | Global Dossier | 02.05.1985 | B1 | EP0052773 | 22.09.1982 | A3 | EP0052773 | 02.06.1982 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE3043900 | 21.11.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3043900 | 05.01.1983 | C2 | DE3043900 | 22.07.1982 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3043900 | 21.11.1980 |