EP0052773 - Distributing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.1986 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.04.1986 [1986/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states R. & G. Schmöle Metallwerke GmbH & Co. KG Fröndenberger Strasse 29 D-5750 Menden 1 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/22] | For all designated states R. & G. Schmöle Metallwerke GmbH & Co. KG Fröndenberger Strasse 29 D-5750 Menden 1 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mayr, Karl-Heinz Berkenhofskamp 11 D-5750 Menden 2 / DE | 02 /
Behm, Ernst, Dipl.-Ing. Harzstrasse 9 D-5750 Menden 1 / DE | [1982/22] | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/22] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 D-40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 81108787.3 | 23.10.1981 | [1982/22] | Priority number, date | DE19803043900 | 21.11.1980 Original published format: DE 3043900 | [1982/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0052773 | Date: | 02.06.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0052773 | Date: | 22.09.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0052773 | Date: | 02.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.1982 | Classification | IPC: | F25B39/02, F25B41/00, B01D1/30, F28F27/02 | [1982/22] | CPC: |
F28F9/0275 (EP);
B01D1/30 (EP);
F25B39/028 (EP);
F25B41/00 (EP);
F25B41/42 (EP);
F25B2500/01 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1982/22] | Title | German: | Verteilervorrichtung | [1982/22] | English: | Distributing device | [1982/22] | French: | Dispositif de distribution | [1982/22] | Examination procedure | 10.08.1982 | Examination requested [1982/42] | 22.12.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 04.05.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.10.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.10.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.12.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 24.12.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.02.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US220595 ; | [A]US2196858 (GLEASON THOMAS C); | [AD]DE2731279 (SCHMITZ KUEHLER BAIERBRUNN) | Examination | US2063380 | US2193696 | US2220595 |