EP0053698 - 5-Amino-1-phenylpyrazole-4-carboxylic acids, process for their preparation, herbicides containing them and their use as herbicides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.1985 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.01.1986 [1986/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/24] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eicken, Karl, Dr. Waldstrasse 63 D-6706 Wachenheim / DE | 02 /
Plath, Peter, Dr. Berner Weg 24 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
Wuerzer, Bruno, Dr. Dipl.-Landw. Ruedigerstrasse 13 D-6701 Otterstadt / DE | [1982/24] | Application number, filing date | 81108815.2 | 23.10.1981 | [1982/24] | Priority number, date | DE19803045903 | 05.12.1980 Original published format: DE 3045903 | DE19813126479 | 04.07.1981 Original published format: DE 3126479 | [1982/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0053698 | Date: | 16.06.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0053698 | Date: | 09.01.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C07D231/38, A01N43/56, // C07C121/82, A01N37/34 | [1982/24] | CPC: |
C07D231/38 (EP,US);
A01N37/44 (EP,US);
A01N43/56 (EP,US);
C07C255/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/24] | Title | German: | 5-Amino-1-phenylpyrazol-4-carbonsäureester, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung, diese enthaltende Herbizide und ihre Anwendung als Herbizide | [1982/24] | English: | 5-Amino-1-phenylpyrazole-4-carboxylic acids, process for their preparation, herbicides containing them and their use as herbicides | [1982/24] | French: | Esters de l'acide amino-5-phényl-1-carboxyl-4-pyrazolique, leur procédé de préparation, les herbicides les contenant et leur application comme herbicides | [1982/24] | Examination procedure | 23.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/24] | 19.05.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.07.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.08.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.05.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.10.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB854632 (CIBA LTD); | [A]US3187006 (JEAN DRUEY, et al); | [E]EP0034945 (MAY & BAKER LTD [GB]) | Examination | EP0002180 |