EP0055807 - Multilayer elements for the manufacture of printing plates and relief forms [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.1986 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.03.1986 [1986/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/28] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jun, Mong-Jon, Dr. Maulbeerstueck 20 D-6720 Speyer / DE | 02 /
Richter, Peter, Dr. Bensheimer Ring 24 D-6710 Frankenthal / DE | 03 /
Barzynski, Helmut, Dr. An der Ameisenhalde 49 D-6702 Bad Duerkheim / DE | [1982/28] | Application number, filing date | 81108842.6 | 24.10.1981 | [1982/28] | Priority number, date | DE19813100175 | 07.01.1981 Original published format: DE 3100175 | [1982/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0055807 | Date: | 14.07.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0055807 | Date: | 25.08.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0055807 | Date: | 06.03.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/02 | [1982/28] | CPC: |
G03F7/11 (EP,US);
G03C1/93 (EP,US);
Y10S430/106 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1982/28] | Title | German: | Zur Herstellung von Druck- und Reliefformen geeignete Mehrschichten-Elemente | [1982/28] | English: | Multilayer elements for the manufacture of printing plates and relief forms | [1982/28] | French: | Eléments multicouches pour la fabrication de plaques d'impression et de formes en relief | [1982/28] | Examination procedure | 24.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/28] | 15.11.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.08.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.12.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1098656 (AGFA AG); | [A]DE2300371 (BASF AG); | [A]DE2415728 (TEIJIN LTD); | [AD]DE2444118 (BASF AG); | [A]GB1440734 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [AD]EP0002321 (BEXFORD LTD [GB]) |