EP0060327 - Device for acoustical or visual gear shifting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.1986 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GB | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VDO Adolf Schindling AG Gräfstrasse 103 D-60487 Frankfurt / DE | [1982/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stier, Bernhard Schwarzwaldstrasse 17 D-6233 Kelkheim-Fischbach / DE | [1982/38] | Representative(s) | Könekamp, Herbert Kruppstrasse 105 60388 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/38] | Könekamp, Herbert, Dipl.-Ing. Sodener Strasse 9 D-65824 Schwalbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 81108864.0 | 24.10.1981 | [1982/38] | Priority number, date | DE19813108920 | 09.03.1981 Original published format: DE 3108920 | [1982/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0060327 | Date: | 22.09.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0060327 | Date: | 02.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q9/00 | [1982/38] | CPC: |
F16H63/42 (EP,US);
G01F9/023 (EP,US);
Y10S74/07 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1982/38] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Erzeugung einer optischen oder akustischen Schaltanweisung | [1982/38] | English: | Device for acoustical or visual gear shifting | [1982/38] | French: | Dispositif d'indication acoustique ou visuelle pour changement de vitesse | [1982/38] | Examination procedure | 27.09.1982 | Examination requested [1982/49] | 08.03.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.10.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.02.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 01.07.1985 | SE | 25.10.1985 | [2015/21] |
Former [1992/36] | DE | 01.07.1985 | |
GB | 24.10.1985 | ||
SE | 25.10.1985 | ||
Former [1989/26] | GB | 24.10.1985 | |
SE | 25.10.1985 | ||
Former [1989/08] | SE | 25.10.1985 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2437317 (SENNELY CLAUDE); | [AD]DE2926070 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG); | [AP]FR2465209 (CITROEN SA [FR]) |