EP0056445 - Method and apparatus for controlling a heating system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 23.01.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/30] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bechtold, Rainer Speckweg 51 D-8521 Möhrendorf / DE | 02 /
Gärtner, Franz-Georg, Dr. Johann-Krieger-Strasse 27 D-8500 Nürnberg / DE | 03 /
Kutschera, Karlheinz, Dr. Alter Garten 10 D-8521 Bräuningshof / DE | [1982/30] | Application number, filing date | 81109047.1 | 27.10.1981 | [1982/30] | Priority number, date | DE19813101637 | 20.01.1981 Original published format: DE 3101637 | [1982/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0056445 | Date: | 28.07.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0056445 | Date: | 02.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.1982 | Classification | IPC: | F24D19/10 | [1982/30] | CPC: |
G05D23/1931 (EP);
F24D19/1039 (EP,US);
G05D23/1919 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Betrieb einer Heizungsanlage und Anordnung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | [1982/30] | English: | Method and apparatus for controlling a heating system | [1982/30] | French: | Procédé pour le fonctionnement d'une installation de chauffage et dispositif d'application du procédé | [1985/18] |
Former [1982/30] | Procédé pour le fonctionnement d'une installation de chauffage et dispositifs d'application du procédé | Examination procedure | 27.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/30] | 29.09.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.02.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.03.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.10.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.01.1986
05.03.1986
ADMISSIBLE Stiebel Eltron GmbH & Co.KG D-37601 Holzminden / DE | 02
31.01.1986
07.04.1986
ADMISSIBLE Joh. Vaillant GmbH u. Co Berghauser Str. 40 Postfach 10 10 61 D-42810 Remscheid / DE Opponent's representative Heim, Johann-Ludwig C/o Joh. Vaillant GmbH u. Co Berghauser Strasse 40 42859 Remscheid / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.01.1986
05.03.1986
ADMISSIBLE Stiebel Eltron GmbH & Co.KG D-37601 Holzminden / DE | ||
02
31.01.1986
07.04.1986
ADMISSIBLE Joh. Vaillant GmbH u. Co Berghauser Str. 40 Postfach 10 10 61 D-42810 Remscheid / DE Opponent's representative Heim, Johann-Ludwig c/o Joh. Vaillant GmbH u. Co Berghauser Strasse 40 D-42859 Remscheid / DE | |||
Former [1986/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.01.1986
05.03.1986
ADMISSIBLE Stiebel Eltron GmbH & Co.KG D-37601 Holzminden / DE | 19.02.1986 | No. 02: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 01.03.1986 | No. 02: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 09.04.1986 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.10.1986 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 18.10.1986 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1987/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.10.1985 | [2015/21] |
Former [1999/52] | CH | 02.05.1985 | |
LI | 02.05.1985 | ||
LU | 31.10.1985 | ||
Former [1989/23] | CH | 02.05.1985 | |
LI | 02.05.1985 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2291455 (AERAZUR CONSTR AERONAUT [FR]); | [A]DE2637209 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | [A]FR2451548 (TOTALGAZ CIE FSE); | [A]DE2919751 (WEISSE DIETRICH H); | [A]DE2927408 (SCHNEIDER KG ASK A) | Examination | EP0042958 |