EP0060332 - TDM switching network unit for space switching [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.1986 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.01.1987 [1987/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/38] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Binz, Reiner, Dipl.-Ing. Rosenstrasse 5 D-8021 Hohenschäftlarn / DE | 02 /
Knorpp, Eberhard, Dipl.-Ing. Zugspitzstrasse 26 D-8035 Gauting / DE | 03 /
von Sichart, Frithjof, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Karl-Theodor-Strasse 72 D-8000 München 40 / DE | [1982/38] | Application number, filing date | 81109048.9 | 27.10.1981 | [1982/38] | Priority number, date | DE19813109808 | 13.03.1981 Original published format: DE 3109808 | [1982/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0060332 | Date: | 22.09.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0060332 | Date: | 29.01.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.1982 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04 | [1982/38] | CPC: |
H04Q11/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1982/38] | Title | German: | Zeitmultiplexkoppelfeldeinheit zur Raumvermittlung | [1982/38] | English: | TDM switching network unit for space switching | [1982/38] | French: | Unité de champ de connexion temporel pour commutation spatiale | [1982/38] | Examination procedure | 27.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/38] | 04.11.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.12.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.04.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 30.10.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0010726 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) | [Y] - COMMUTATION & ELECTRONIQUE, Heft 43, Oktober 1973, Seiten 52-70, Issy-Les-Moulineaux, FR, P. VOYER et al.: "Reseaux de connexion temporels a grande capacite" |