EP0051800 - Anti-locking device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.1986 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.06.1986 [1986/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALFRED TEVES GmbH Guerickestrasse 7 Postfach 90 01 20 60441 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/51] | For all designated states ALFRED TEVES GmbH Guerickestrasse 7 Postfach 90 01 20 D-60441 Frankfurt / DE | ||
Former [1982/20] | For all designated states GEORG FISCHER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Mühlentalstrasse 105 CH-8201 Schaffhausen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Widmer, Max Neuweg 71 CH-8222 Beringen / CH | [1982/20] | Application number, filing date | 81109094.3 | 28.10.1981 | [1982/20] | Priority number, date | CH19800008349 | 11.11.1980 Original published format: CH 834980 | [1982/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0051800 | Date: | 19.05.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0051800 | Date: | 26.06.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/32, B60T8/40, B60T8/64 | [1985/26] | CPC: |
B60T8/368 (EP,US);
B60T8/4031 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1982/20] | B60T8/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1982/20] | Title | German: | Antiblockiervorrichtung | [1982/20] | English: | Anti-locking device | [1982/20] | French: | Dispositif d'antiblocage | [1982/20] | Examination procedure | 21.08.1982 | Examination requested [1982/44] | 22.11.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.11.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.03.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2825480 [ ] (GOODYEAR AEROSPACE CORP); | FR2189238 [ ] (LEROY MARCEL [FR]) |