EP0052286 - Rubber compositions and vulcanizates prepared therefrom [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 19.02.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/21] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | 02 /
* * * | [1982/21] | Application number, filing date | 81109324.4 | 30.10.1981 | [1982/21] | Priority number, date | DE19803043227 | 15.11.1980 Original published format: DE 3043227 | [1982/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0052286 | Date: | 26.05.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0052286 | Date: | 21.07.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0052286 | Date: | 30.05.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C08L21/00, C08J5/10 | [1982/21] | CPC: |
C08J5/10 (EP,US);
C08L21/00 (EP,US);
C08J2321/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12562 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L21/00, C08L2666/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1984/04] |
Former [1982/21] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Kautschukmischungen und daraus hergestellte Vulkanisate | [1982/21] | English: | Rubber compositions and vulcanizates prepared therefrom | [1982/21] | French: | Compositions de caoutchouc et vulcanisats en résultant | [1982/21] | Examination procedure | 07.08.1982 | Examination requested [1982/41] | 13.04.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.04.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.11.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
31.01.1985
04.03.1985
ADMISSIBLE Degussa AG, Frankfurt - Zweigniederlassung Wolfgang- Postfach 13 45 D-63403 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.01.1985
04.03.1985
ADMISSIBLE Degussa AG, Frankfurt - Zweigniederlassung Wolfgang- Postfach 13 45 D-63403 Hanau / DE | 06.03.1985 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.09.1985 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.02.1986 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 03.05.1986 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 23.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.1987 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 19.05.1988 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 19.12.1990 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 15.02.1991 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1991/15] | Appeal following opposition | 20.07.1988 | Appeal received No. T0334/88 | 09.09.1988 | Statement of grounds filed | 19.12.1990 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 19.12.1990 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.12.1990 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.10.1984 | [2015/21] |
Former [1999/52] | CH | 30.05.1984 | |
LI | 30.05.1984 | ||
LU | 31.10.1984 | ||
Former [1991/43] | CH | 30.05.1984 | |
LI | 30.05.1984 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1389800 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD); | [AD]US4148769 (SWARTS JOHN M, et al); | [A]DE2802894 (VOELK POLYKARP) | Examination | DE2553256 | DE2750909 | DE2841401 | EP0031398 | EP0067488 | - Chemical Division, PPG Industries Inc., Barberton, Ohio | - M.P. Wagner, N.L. Hewitt: New Developments in a Dynamic Wire Athesion Test |