EP0052325 - Hair-dressing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.1986 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.01.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.1986 [1986/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bauer, Rudolf Königstrasse 84 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/21] | For all designated states Bauer, Rudolf Königstrasse 84 D-70173 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1982/21] | Representative(s) | Dreiss, Uwe, et al DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Gerokstrasse 1 70188 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/21] | Dreiss, Uwe, Dr. jur. Dipl.-Ing. M.Sc., et al Patentanwälte Dreiss, Hosenthien & Fuhlendorf Gerokstrasse 6 D-70188 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 81109583.5 | 10.11.1981 | [1982/21] | Priority number, date | DE19803043470 | 18.11.1980 Original published format: DE 3043470 | [1982/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0052325 | Date: | 26.05.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0052325 | Date: | 14.09.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0052325 | Date: | 20.02.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.1983 | Classification | IPC: | A45D20/10 | [1982/21] | CPC: |
A45D20/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1982/21] | Title | German: | Frisiergerät | [1982/21] | English: | Hair-dressing apparatus | [1982/21] | French: | Appareil de coiffure | [1982/21] | Examination procedure | 03.10.1983 | Examination requested [1983/51] | 13.07.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.08.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.11.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3213860 (MIZELL LOUIS R, et al); | [A]US3894547 (SCIVOLETTO JOSEPH P); | [A]US3901249 (RUSSELL LESLIE JOHN); | [A]DE7519754U ; | [A]DE2502821 (LIEDTKE DIETER W); | [A]FR2320711 (DROIN MICHEL [FR]); | [AD]DE2754304 (POGGETTI PIETRO); | [A]DE2850515 (BRAUN AG) |