EP0078863 - Method for recovering synthetic resinous latex solids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 18.04.1989 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.1989 | Opposition rejected | published on 07.06.1989 [1989/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Dow Chemical Company 2020 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/20] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Abbott Road P.O. Box 1967 Midland Michigan 48640-1967 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pingel, Ronald James 1312 Scott Midland Michigan / US | 02 /
Onifer, Geofrey Paul 2617 Peterson Sanford Michigan / US | 03 /
Spencer, Thomas Lee 5189 Baker Coleman Michigan / US | [1983/20] | Representative(s) | Weickmann, Heinrich, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/31] | Weickmann, Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | ||
Former [1983/20] | Weickmann, Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. H. Weickmann Dipl.-Phys.Dr. K. Fincke Dipl.-Ing. F.A. Weickmann Dipl.-Chem. B. Huber Dr.-Ing. H. Liska M hlstrasse 22 D-8000 München 86 / DE | Application number, filing date | 81109603.1 | 10.11.1981 | [1983/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0078863 | Date: | 18.05.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0078863 | Date: | 01.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C08F6/22, C08F6/00 | [1986/40] | CPC: |
B29B17/00 (EP,US);
B29B13/06 (EP,US);
B29B15/04 (EP,US);
B29B7/007 (EP,US);
C08C1/14 (EP,US);
C08F6/22 (EP,US);
B29K2021/00 (EP,US);
B29K2105/0064 (EP,US);
Y02W30/62 (EP,US);
Y10S528/936 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F6/22, C08F12/08, C08F20/44 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1983/20] | C08F6/22, B29H1/06, B29H1/10, // (C08F6/22, 12:08, 20:44) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1983/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Rückgewinnung von festem Latex aus synthetischen Harzen | [1983/20] | English: | Method for recovering synthetic resinous latex solids | [1983/20] | French: | Méthode pour la récupération de latex solides de résine synthétique | [1983/20] | Examination procedure | 21.09.1982 | Examination requested [1983/20] | 05.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 26.03.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.06.1987
05.08.1987
ADMISSIBLE Röhm GmbH Kirschenallee 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.06.1987
05.08.1987
ADMISSIBLE Röhm GmbH Kirschenallee D-64293 Darmstadt / DE | 07.08.1987 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.02.1988 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.02.1988 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 22.04.1988 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 11.01.1989 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 21.01.1989 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1989/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2854426 (DASHER PAUL J); | [A]FR2270076 (STANDARD OIL CO [US]); | [A]US4148991 (SKIDMORE RICHARD H) |