EP0052359 - Continuously operating press [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 24.01.1990 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Constructiewerkhuizen De Mets N.V. Priester Pattynstraat 1 B-8701 Izegem/Kachtem / BE | [1987/21] |
Former [1982/21] | For all designated states De Mets N.V. Pr. Pattynstraat 1 B-8701 Izegem/Kachtem / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [1982/21] | Representative(s) | Säger, Manfred, et al Säger & Hofmann Patent AG Feldgüetliweg 130 8706 Meilen (ZH) / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Säger, Manfred, et al Säger & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei (GbR) Römersteig 2 Postfach 5 7304 Maienfeld / CH | ||
Former [1982/21] | Säger, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing., et al Lesser, Flügel & Säger Patentanwälte Richard-Strauss-Strasse 56 Postfach 81 05 40 D-8000 München 80 / DE | Application number, filing date | 81109682.5 | 13.11.1981 | [1982/21] | Priority number, date | DE19800030533U | 14.11.1980 Original published format: DE 8030533 U | DE19810015711U | 26.05.1981 Original published format: DE 8115711 U | [1982/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0052359 | Date: | 26.05.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0052359 | Date: | 11.05.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0052359 | Date: | 20.01.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B30B5/06, B27N3/24 | [1988/03] | CPC: |
B27N3/24 (EP,US);
B30B15/0088 (EP);
B30B5/065 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1982/21] | B30B5/06, B29J5/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1982/33] |
Former [1982/21] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Kontinuierlich arbeitende Presse | [1982/21] | English: | Continuously operating press | [1982/21] | French: | Presse fonctionnant en continu | [1982/21] | Examination procedure | 12.03.1982 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) LU, NL | 23.05.1982 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.06.1983 | Examination requested [1983/35] | 06.02.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.06.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.10.1988
11.01.1989
ADMISSIBLE Hymmen GmbH Maschinen- und Anlagenbau Postfach 10 15 13 D-33515 Bielefeld / DE Opponent's representative Stracke, Alexander Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [2008/33] |
Former [1988/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.10.1988
11.01.1989
ADMISSIBLE Hymmen GmbH Maschinen- und Anlagenbau Postfach 10 15 13 D-33515 Bielefeld / DE Opponent's representative Stracke, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Loesenbeck Dipl.-Ing. Stracke Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 Postfach 10 18 82 D-33518 Bielefeld / DE | 13.01.1989 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 24.02.1989 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.03.1989 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 29.04.1989 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 16.10.1989 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 26.10.1989 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1990/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.12.1981 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 14.12.1981 | NL   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3215065 (MALARKEY JR NEIL); | [AD]DE1938280 (KNAPP HANS JOHN); | [A]DE1704839 (HENNECKE GMBH MASCHF); | [A]DE2224977 ; | [A]DE2330306 (DIEFFENBACHER GMBH MASCHF); | [AD]DE2511878 (DIEFFENBACHER GMBH MASCHF); | [A]US4064299 (MARTIN RONALD T) |