EP0053311 - Substituted 1-phenyl-2-triazolyl-1-penten-3-ols, their preparation and use as fungicides and plant-growth regulants [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.1986 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.08.1986 [1986/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/23] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Regel, Erik Bergerheide 72a D-5600 Wuppertal 1 / DE | 02 /
Büchel, Karl-Heinz, Prof. Dr. Dabringhausener Strasse 42 D-5093 Burscheid / DE | 03 /
Lürssen, Klaus, Dr. August-Kierspel-Strasse 89 D-5070 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 04 /
Frohberger, Paul-Ernst, Dr. Willi-Baumeister-Strasse 5 D-5090 Leverkusen / DE | [1982/23] | Application number, filing date | 81109686.6 | 14.11.1981 | [1982/23] | Priority number, date | DE19803044802 | 28.11.1980 Original published format: DE 3044802 | [1982/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0053311 | Date: | 09.06.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0053311 | Date: | 01.09.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0053311 | Date: | 04.09.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C07D249/08, A01N43/64 | [1982/23] | CPC: |
C07D231/12 (EP);
A01N43/653 (EP);
C07D249/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/23] | Title | German: | Substituierte 1-Phenyl-2-triazolyl-1-penten-3-ole, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung sowie ihre Verwendung als Pflanzenwachstumsregulatoren und Fungizide | [1982/23] | English: | Substituted 1-phenyl-2-triazolyl-1-penten-3-ols, their preparation and use as fungicides and plant-growth regulants | [1982/23] | French: | Phényl-1-triazolyl-2-penten-1-oles-3, leur préparation et leur emploi comme fongicides et régulateurs de croissance des plantes | [1982/23] | Examination procedure | 14.11.1981 | Examination requested [1982/23] | 14.09.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.05.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.09.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.02.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP84105330.9 / EP0130318 | Opposition(s) | 05.06.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2327242 (ICI LTD [GB]); | [XD]GB2004276 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO); | [A]US4182862 (CHAN HAK-FOON [US]); | [Y]EP0015387 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [X]GB2046260 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO); | [X]DE2920437 (BAYER AG); | [P]EP0022975 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [P]EP0028363 (BASF AG [DE]) |