EP0056108 - Heating boiler for low temperature heating-systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 15.07.1986 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.1986 | Opposition rejected | published on 03.09.1986 [1986/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOVAL INTERLIZ AG Austrasse 70 FL-9490 Vaduz-Neugut / LI | [1982/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ospelt, Gustav, Dr. techn. h.c. Im St. Johanner Vaduz / LI | [1982/29] | Representative(s) | Louis, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Walter Louis Dipl.-Ing. Günter Louis Stubertal 3 D-45149 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/29] | Louis, Walter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Walter Louis Dipl.-Ing. Günter Louis Stubertal 3 D-45149 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 81109797.1 | 20.11.1981 | [1982/29] | Priority number, date | DE19813100888 | 14.01.1981 Original published format: DE 3100888 | [1982/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0056108 | Date: | 21.07.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0056108 | Date: | 25.07.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.1982 | Classification | IPC: | F24H1/18, F24H1/28 | [1982/29] | CPC: |
F24H1/287 (EP);
F24H9/0036 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI [1982/29] | Title | German: | Heizkessel für Niedertemperatur-Heizungen | [1982/29] | English: | Heating boiler for low temperature heating-systems | [1982/29] | French: | Chaudière pour le chauffage à basse température | [1982/29] | Examination procedure | 14.12.1982 | Examination requested [1983/09] | 18.10.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.01.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
30.11.1984
10.03.1985
ADMISSIBLE Joh. Vaillant GmbH u. Co Berghauser Str. 40 Postfach 10 10 61 D-42810 Remscheid / DE Opponent's representative Heim, Johann-Ludwig C/o Joh. Vaillant GmbH u. Co Berghauser Strasse 40 42859 Remscheid / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.11.1984
10.03.1985
ADMISSIBLE Joh. Vaillant GmbH u. Co Berghauser Str. 40 Postfach 10 10 61 D-42810 Remscheid / DE Opponent's representative Heim, Johann-Ludwig c/o Joh. Vaillant GmbH u. Co Berghauser Strasse 40 D-42859 Remscheid / DE | 26.01.1985 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.01.1985 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.03.1985 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 27.01.1986 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1986/36] | 26.02.1986 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1889560U [ ] (WAGNER GEBRUEDER [DE]); | AU4138068 [ ] (MRS FREDA MCPHERSON) |