EP0053363 - Bushing for gas-insulated electrical equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.1986 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1982/23] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kishida, Mitsuhiro Itami Works of Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 80, Aza Nakano, Minami Shimizu City of Amagasaki Hyogo Prefecture / JP | [1982/23] | Representative(s) | Kern, Ralf M. advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sollner Strasse 38 81479 München / DE | [2008/41] |
Former [1984/23] | Kern, Ralf M., Dipl.-Ing. Ralf M. Kern & Partner Anwaltsbüro Postfach 14 03 29 D-80453 München / DE | ||
Former [1982/39] | Kern, Ralf M., Dipl.-Ing. Assenbucherstrasse 67 Postfach 56 D-8137 Berg 1 (bei München) / DE | ||
Former [1982/38] | Patentanwälte Henkel, Pfenning, Feiler, Hänzel & Meinig Möhlstrasse 37 D-8000 München 80 / DE | ||
Former [1982/23] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81109932.4 | 26.11.1981 | [1982/23] | Priority number, date | JP19800168911 | 27.11.1980 Original published format: JP 16891180 | JP19800176738 | 11.12.1980 Original published format: JP 17673880 | JP19800176739 | 11.12.1980 Original published format: JP 17673980 | [1982/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0053363 | Date: | 09.06.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0053363 | Date: | 28.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.1982 | Classification | IPC: | H01B17/36 | [1982/23] | CPC: |
H01B17/36 (EP,US);
H02G15/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, SE [1982/23] | Title | German: | Durchführung für gasisolierte, elektrische Geräte | [1982/23] | English: | Bushing for gas-insulated electrical equipment | [1982/23] | French: | Traversée pour appareillage électrique isolé au gaz | [1982/23] | Examination procedure | 09.08.1982 | Examination requested [1982/42] | 27.10.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.02.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH616265 (GOULD INC [US]); | [A]FR2389206 (SPRECHER & SCHUH AG [CH]); | [A]FR1587136 ; | [A]FR2316709 (HAEFELY & CIE AG EMIL [CH]); | [A]US3230301 (SONNENBERG CHARLES F, et al) |