EP0053379 - Anti-peptic ulcer agent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.01.1986 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 5-1, 5-chome, Ukima Kita-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1982/23] | For all designated states Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 5-1, 5-chome, Ukima Kita-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanemura, Mitsuru 3-2-2-805, Suwa Tama-shi Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Yamazaki, Tamotsu 732-3, Yamaguchi Tokorozawa-shi Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Mizuno, Koji 50-8, Kujiraishinden Kawagoe-shi Saitama-ken / JP | 04 /
Kaiho, Shin-ichi 551, Takashina-cho Chiba-shi Chiba-ken / JP | 05 /
Kakimoto, Morio 728-28, Oazaimafuku Kawagoe-shi Saitama-ken / JP | 06 /
Hoshino, Eiichi Yonodanchi 2-506, 1006 Shimoochiai, Yono-shi Saitama-ken / JP | 07 /
Matsunaga, Isao 3140-20, Nishiohizumi-cho Nerima-ku Tokyo / JP | 08 /
Hata, Shun-ichi 675-14, Nishitani-cho Hodogaya-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1982/23] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/23] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81109971.2 | 27.11.1981 | [1982/23] | Priority number, date | JP19800166662 | 28.11.1980 Original published format: JP 16666280 | [1982/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0053379 | Date: | 09.06.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.1982 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/195, C07C101/48, C07C101/72 | [1982/23] | CPC: |
C07C229/58 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/23] | Title | German: | Mittel gegen peptische Geschwüre | [1982/23] | English: | Anti-peptic ulcer agent | [1982/23] | French: | Agent pour le traitement d'ulcères peptiques | [1982/23] | File destroyed: | 01.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 27.11.1981 | Examination requested [1982/23] | 09.06.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.08.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/10] | 20.09.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1986/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB989951 [ ] (PARKE DAVIS & CO); | [X]GB1520179 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD) | [ ] - progress in drug research vol. 24, (1980), 101-216 pages 185, 186, 215(ref. 433) |