EP0053772 - A process for treating wastewaters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.1985 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.1986 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.03.1986 [1986/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STERLING DRUG INC. 90 Park Avenue New York New York / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/24] | For all designated states STERLING DRUG INC. 90 Park Avenue New York New York / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Teletzke, Gerald Howard 1403 Stark Street Wausau Wisconsin / US | 02 /
Erickson, Allen Hugh 2007 Douglas Drive Schofield Wisconsin / US | [1982/24] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/24] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81109977.9 | 27.11.1981 | [1982/24] | Priority number, date | US19800214450 | 08.12.1980 Original published format: US 214450 | [1982/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0053772 | Date: | 16.06.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0053772 | Date: | 14.11.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/06 | [1982/24] | CPC: |
C02F3/1226 (EP);
C02F3/00 (KR);
C02F3/04 (EP);
C02F3/121 (EP);
Y02W10/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/24] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Behandlung von Abwässern | [1982/24] | English: | A process for treating wastewaters | [1982/24] | French: | Procédé de traitement d'eaux usées | [1982/24] | Examination procedure | 08.12.1982 | Examination requested [1983/08] | 22.06.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.05.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 14.11.1984 | [1986/11] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4123359 (SMITH JOHN D); | [A]GB1574922 (NIIGATA ENGINEERING CO LTD) |