EP0056458 - Nitrosourea derivatives, a process for preparing same and therapeutic compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.1986 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.05.1986 [1986/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tanabe Seiyaku Co., Ltd. No. 21 Dosho-machi 3-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1982/30] | For all designated states Tanabe Seiyaku Co., Ltd. No. 21 Dosho-machi 3-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morikawa, Tamio No. 16-2, Kaminakazato 2-chome Kita-ku Tokyo-to / JP | 02 /
Tsujihara, Kenji No. 1149-133, Oaza-Omaki Urawa-shi Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Arai, Yoshihisa No. 17-1, Maechi 3-chome Urawa-shi Saitama-ken / JP | [1982/30] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/30] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81110217.7 | 07.12.1981 | [1982/30] | Priority number, date | JP19810006860 | 19.01.1981 Original published format: JP 686081 | [1982/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0056458 | Date: | 28.07.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0056458 | Date: | 02.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C07H15/04, A61K31/70, // C07H13/12 | [1982/30] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
C07H13/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1982/30] | Title | German: | Nitroso-Harnstoff-Verbindungen, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und therapeutische Zubereitung | [1982/30] | English: | Nitrosourea derivatives, a process for preparing same and therapeutic compositions | [1982/30] | French: | Dérivés de nitrosourées, procédé pour leur préparation et compositions thérapeutiques | [1982/30] | Examination procedure | 19.08.1982 | Examination requested [1982/43] | 26.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 27.12.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.10.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.02.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP54144319 ; | [Y]JP54157527 | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 92, 1980, page 631, no. 147144h, Columbus, Ohio, U.S.A. & JP-A-54 144 319 (KAKEN CHEMICAL CO.,LTD.) 10-11-1979, & JP54144319 A 00000000 | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 92, 1980, page 660, no. 215731z, Columbus, Ohio, U.S.A. & JP-A-54 157 527 (TANABE SEIYAKU CO.,LTD.) 12-12-1979, & JP54157527 A 00000000 | Examination | JPS554324 |