EP0057277 - Multiple function switch for electrical apparatuses such as hair dryers or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.1986 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.08.1986 [1986/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Braun Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 11 20 D-61466 Kronberg / DE | [1982/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Voigt, Gottfried Narzissenstrasse 17 D-6000 Frankfurt/Main 56 / DE | [1982/32] | Representative(s) | Einsele, Rolf Braun Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 1120 61466 Kronberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/44] | Einsele, Rolf Braun Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 11 20 D-61466 Kronberg / DE | ||
Former [1982/32] | Einsele, Rolf Braun Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 1120 Frankfurter Strasse 145 D-6242 Kronberg/Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 81110335.7 | 11.12.1981 | [1982/32] | Priority number, date | DE19813103457 | 02.02.1981 Original published format: DE 3103457 | [1982/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0057277 | Date: | 11.08.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0057277 | Date: | 11.05.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0057277 | Date: | 14.08.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.1983 | Classification | IPC: | H01H25/06, A45D20/10 | [1982/32] | CPC: |
H01H25/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1982/32] | Title | German: | Mehrfunktionsschalter für elektrische Geräte wie Haartrockner oder dergl. | [1985/33] | English: | Multiple function switch for electrical apparatuses such as hair dryers or the like | [1982/32] | French: | Interrupteur à fonctions multiples pour des appareils électriques tels que des sèche-cheveux ou analogues | [1985/33] |
Former [1982/32] | Mehrfach-Funktionsschalter für elektrische Geräte wie Haartrockner oder dergl. | ||
Former [1982/32] | Interrupteur à fonctions multiples pour des appareils électriques commes des sèche-cheveux ou analogues | Examination procedure | 11.06.1983 | Examination requested [1983/34] | 29.05.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.10.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.02.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2238363 (BAER ELEKTROWERKE KG); | [Y]DE2624600 (SPERRY RAND CORP); | [Y]DE2708581 (BRAUN AG); | [A]WO8001736 (BRAUN AG [DE], et al) |