EP0054878 - Suction control device for an endoscope [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.1986 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Optical Co., Ltd. 43-2, 2-chome, Hatagaya Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1982/26] | For all designated states OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO., LTD. 43-2, 2-chome, Hatagaya Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Konomura, Yutaka 4-22-13, Owasa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo / JP | [1982/26] | Representative(s) | Lins, Edgar, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/26] | Lins, Edgar, Dipl.-Phys. Dr.jur., et al Patentanwälte Gramm + Lins Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 D-38122 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 81110416.5 | 14.12.1981 | [1982/26] | Priority number, date | JP19800180228 | 19.12.1980 Original published format: JP 18022880 | JP19800180229 | 19.12.1980 Original published format: JP 18022980 | [1982/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0054878 | Date: | 30.06.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0054878 | Date: | 27.10.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0054878 | Date: | 20.03.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.1982 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/00, A61B1/00 | [1982/26] | CPC: |
A61M1/7411 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/26] | Title | German: | Absaugsteuervorrichtung für ein Endoskop | [1982/26] | English: | Suction control device for an endoscope | [1982/26] | French: | Système de commande d'aspiration pour un endoscope | [1982/26] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 02.11.1982 | Examination requested [1983/02] | 09.11.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.07.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.12.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.11.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.03.1985 | BE | 20.03.1985 | CH | 20.03.1985 | IT | 20.03.1985 | LI | 20.03.1985 | NL | 20.03.1985 | SE | 20.03.1985 | [1999/42] |
Former [1989/18] | AT | 20.03.1985 | |
BE | 20.03.1985 | ||
CH | 20.03.1985 | ||
LI | 20.03.1985 | ||
NL | 20.03.1985 | ||
SE | 20.03.1985 | ||
Former [1988/13] | AT | 20.03.1985 | |
BE | 20.03.1985 | ||
NL | 20.03.1985 | ||
SE | 20.03.1985 | ||
Former [1988/04] | AT | 20.03.1985 | |
BE | 20.03.1985 | ||
NL | 20.03.1985 | ||
Former [1986/24] | AT | 20.03.1985 | |
NL | 20.03.1985 | ||
Former [1986/23] | AT | 20.03.1985 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2823921 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [Y]US3707972 (VILLARI F, et al); | [Y]US3741217 (CIARICO A); | [AP]DE3037110 (MEDOS KENKYUSHO KK [JP]) |