Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3048718 | 26.08.1982 | C2 | DE3048718 | 22.07.1982 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3048718 | 23.12.1980 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3116254 | 17.11.1983 | C2 | DE3116254 | 04.11.1982 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3116254 | 23.04.1981 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN157743 | 31.05.1986 | B | Priority number | Date | DE3048718 | 23.12.1980 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS6229317B | 25.06.1987 | B2 | JPS57163688 | 07.10.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3048718 | 23.12.1980 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SU1457815 | 07.02.1989 | A3 | Priority number | Date | DE3048718 | 23.12.1980 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA818759 | 24.11.1982 | B | Priority number | Date | DE3048718 | 23.12.1980 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU546746B | ![]() | 19.09.1985 | B2 | AU7885881 | 01.07.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3048718 | 23.12.1980 | DE3116254 | 23.04.1981 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0054881 | ![]() | 24.10.1984 | B1 | EP0054881 | 30.06.1982 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3048718 | 23.12.1980 | DE3116254 | 23.04.1981 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1169370 | 19.06.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3048718 | 23.12.1980 | DE3116254 | 23.04.1981 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DD201871 | 17.08.1983 | A5 | Priority number | Date | DE3048718 | 23.12.1980 | DE3116254 | 23.04.1981 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK80887 | 06.11.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3048718 | 23.12.1980 | DE3116254 | 23.04.1981 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX153988 | 18.03.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3048718 | 23.12.1980 | DE3116254 | 23.04.1981 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ199389 | 06.07.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3048718 | 23.12.1980 | DE3116254 | 23.04.1981 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG45587G | 24.07.1987 | G | Priority number | Date | DE3048718 | 23.12.1980 | DE3116254 | 23.04.1981 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4521941 | 11.06.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3048718 | 23.12.1980 | DE3116254 | 23.04.1981 |