blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0054881

EP0054881 - Corner fittings for freight containers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.08.1985
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.1985No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.10.1985 [1985/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Westerwälder Eisenwerk Gerhard GmbH
Ringstrasse Postfach 20
D-57586 Weitefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [1982/26]For all designated states
Westerwälder Eisenwerk Gerhard GmbH
Ringstrasse Postfach 20
D-57586 Weitefeld / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Gerhard, Helmut
im Schlosssteinchen 23
D-5241 Weitefeld / DE
[1982/26]
Representative(s)Strehl, Peter, et al
Patentanwälte
Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner
Maximilianstrasse 54
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1983/39]Strehl, Peter, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Patentanwälte Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening u. Partner Postfach 22 14 55
D-80504 München / DE
Former [1982/26]Strehl, Peter, Dipl.-Ing.
K.L. Schiff Dr. A. v. Funer Dipl.-Ing. P. Strehl Dr. U. Schübel-Hopf Dipl.-Ing. D. Ebbinghaus Dr.-Ing. D. Finck Patentanwälte Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3
D-8000 München 90 / DE
Application number, filing date81110432.214.12.1981
[1982/26]
Priority number, dateDE1980304871823.12.1980         Original published format: DE 3048718
DE1981311625423.04.1981         Original published format: DE 3116254
[1982/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0054881
Date:30.06.1982
Language:DE
[1982/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0054881
Date:24.10.1984
Language:DE
[1984/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.03.1982
ClassificationIPC:B65D90/00
[1982/26]
CPC:
B65D90/0026 (EP,US); B65D90/0033 (EP,US); Y10T24/28 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1982/26]
TitleGerman:Eckbeschlag für Frachtcontainer[1982/26]
English:Corner fittings for freight containers[1982/26]
French:Pièces de coin pour un conteneur de marchandises[1982/26]
Examination procedure29.04.1982Examination requested  [1982/28]
21.10.1983Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
17.04.1984Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.07.1984Fee for grant paid
27.07.1984Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.07.1985No opposition filed within time limit [1985/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchDE2159856  [ ];
 DE1952581  [ ] (WITTMANN AG GUSSTAHLWERK)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.