EP0054935 - High speed digital position monitoring system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.08.1987 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KEARNEY & TRECKER CORPORATION 11000 Theodore Trecker Way West Allis Wisconsin 53214 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/26] | For all designated states KEARNEY & TRECKER CORPORATION 11000 Theodore Trecker Way West Allis Wisconsin 53214 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ilseman, Kenneth A. 14635 Woodridge Circle Brookfield Wisconsin / US | 02 /
Caddell, Richard W. 19100 North Hill Drive Brookfield Wisconsin, 53005 / US | [1982/26] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/26] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81110593.1 | 18.12.1981 | [1982/26] | Priority number, date | US19800218488 | 22.12.1980 Original published format: US 218488 | [1982/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0054935 | Date: | 30.06.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0054935 | Date: | 31.08.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G05D3/20, G05B19/35, G08C21/00 | [1983/35] | CPC: |
G05B19/351 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1982/26] | G05D3/20, G08C21/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/26] | Title | German: | Digitales Hochgeschwindigkeits-Positions-Überwachungssystem | [1982/26] | English: | High speed digital position monitoring system | [1982/26] | French: | Système numérique de régulation de position à grande vitesse | [1982/26] | File destroyed: | 14.04.1993 | Examination procedure | 27.02.1984 | Examination requested [1984/20] | 10.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.10.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1987/42] | 22.05.1987 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1987/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1986 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | deleted | |
Former [1983/25] | ID: | 01 00/exclusive | |
For: | GB | ||
Licencee: | KEARNEY & TRECKER MARWIN LIMITED Crowhurst Road Hollingbury Brighton BN1 8AU / GB | ||
Date: | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2138042 (BENDIX CORP); | [A]US4001558 (KELLING LEROY U C); | [Y]DE2633846 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [A]US4095158 (MATSUMOTO MITSUO); | [A]DE2910928 (DANA CORP) | [Y] - ELEKTRONIK, vol. 29, no. 18, 1980, H. SAX "Positionierungssystem kommt mit drei Chips aus", pages 47-54 |