EP0055845 - Method of making telescopic cylinders [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.11.1986 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bent Storm Sorensen Holding Aps Hobrovej 317 DK-9200 Aalborg SV / DK | [1982/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sorensen, Bent Storm Hobrovej 317 DK-9200 Aalborg SV / DK | 02 /
Sorensen, Niels Klaestrupholmsvej 22 9230 Svenstrup J / DK | [1982/28] | Representative(s) | Wenzel & Kalkoff Patentanwälte Meiendorfer Strasse 89 22145 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/46] | Wenzel & Kalkoff Patentanwälte Meiendorfer Stasse 89 22145 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1982/28] | Patentanwälte Wenzel & Kalkoff Postfach 73 04 66, Grubesallee 26 D-22124 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 81110706.9 | 23.12.1981 | [1982/28] | Priority number, date | DK19800005493 | 23.12.1980 Original published format: DK 549380 | [1982/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0055845 | Date: | 14.07.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0055845 | Date: | 18.05.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B23P15/00 | [1982/28] | CPC: |
B23P15/00 (EP);
F16J10/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/28] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von hydraulischen Teleskopzylindern | [1982/28] | English: | Method of making telescopic cylinders | [1982/28] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de cylindres téléscopiques | [1982/28] | File destroyed: | 01.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 18.11.1983 | Examination requested [1984/05] | 02.11.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/52] | 30.07.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1986/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1985 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3046948 ; | [X]US2692584 ; | [X]FR2446407 ; | [X]FR2109232 ; | [AD]DE2004117 ; | [AD]DE2324722 |