EP0055857 - Potentiation of topical compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.11.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/28] | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leung, Pak Sang 15 Woodland Road Highland Mills New York 10930 / US | 02 /
Goddard, Errol Desmond 349 Pleasant Lane Haworth New Jersey 17641 / US | [1982/28] | Representative(s) | Wuesthoff, Franz, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/28] | Wuesthoff, Franz, Dr.-Ing., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81110825.7 | 29.12.1981 | [1982/28] | Priority number, date | US19800221504 | 30.12.1980 Original published format: US 221504 | [1982/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0055857 | Date: | 14.07.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0055857 | Date: | 03.08.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.1983 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/42, A61K9/70, A01N25/10, C08K5/00 | [1982/28] | CPC: |
A61Q17/04 (EP);
A01N25/24 (EP);
A61K8/445 (EP);
A61K8/731 (EP);
A61K8/8129 (EP);
A61K8/817 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61L26/0023, C08L1/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/28] | Title | German: | Erhöhung der Wirksamkeit topischer Präparate | [1982/28] | English: | Potentiation of topical compositions | [1982/28] | French: | Augmentation de l'activité de compositions topiques | [1982/28] | File destroyed: | 14.04.1993 | Examination procedure | 26.10.1983 | Examination requested [1984/03] | 22.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 21.10.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.09.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.03.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1988/01] | 13.08.1987 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1988/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3832310 ; | [X]FR2199971 ; | [XD]US3895104 ; | [Y]FR2268516 ; | [XP]EP0041654 | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 90, no. 16, 16th April 1979, page 364, cols. 1-2, no. 127391s, Columbus Ohio (USA); | [Y] - H.FEY: "Wörterbuch der Kosmetik", 1974, Wissenschaftliche Verlagsgesellschaft mbH, Stuttgart (DE); | [Y] - "The Merck Index", 9th Edition, 1976, Merck & Co., Inc., Rahway, N.J., (USA); |