EP0035298 - Process for the solvent fractionation of olive oil stearine and related products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.1986 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.07.1986 [1986/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1985/41] | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 CH-1800 Vevey / CH | ||
Former [1981/36] | For all designated states BIOCELL S.p.A. Via Emilia Ovest, 85 I-43100 Parma / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Luddy, Francis E. 611 Orchard Way Hatboro, PA 19040 / US | 02 /
Longhi, Sergio Via Verdi, 25 I-43100 Parma / IT | [1981/36] | Representative(s) | Giambrocono, Alfonso, et al Giambrocono & C. S.p.A. Via Rosolino Pilo 19/B 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1981/36] | Giambrocono, Alfonso, Dr. Ing., et al Ing. A. Giambrocono & C. S.r.l. Via Rosolino Pilo 19/B I-20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 81200180.8 | 16.02.1981 | [1981/36] | Priority number, date | IT19800020225 | 28.02.1980 Original published format: IT 2022580 | [1981/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0035298 | Date: | 09.09.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0035298 | Date: | 24.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C11B7/00 | [1981/36] | CPC: |
C11B7/0008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1981/36] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Lösungsmittelfraktionierung von Olivenöl-Stearin und verwandte Produkte | [1985/30] | English: | Process for the solvent fractionation of olive oil stearine and related products | [1981/36] | French: | Procédé de fractionnement en présence de solvant de stéarine d'huile d'olive, et les produits concernés | [1981/36] |
Former [1981/36] | Verfahren zur Lösungsmittelfraktionierung von Stearin-Olivenöl und verwandte Produkte | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 15.01.1982 | Examination requested [1982/15] | 04.02.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.07.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.11.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1985 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   26.03.1985 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB750045 [ ] (TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORP); | US3431116 [ ] (FEUGE REUBEN O, et al); | FR2427386 [ ] (LESIEUR COTELLE [FR]) |