EP0037141 - Purification of cyanuric acid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.1985 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FMC CORPORATION 2000 Market Street Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/40] | For all designated states FMC Corporation 2000 Market Street Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guiliano, Basil Anthony 11-16 Hunters Glen Drive Plainsboro New Jersey 08536 / US | 02 /
Pfeffer, Henry Albert 6 Hollyhock Way Mercerville New Jersey 08619 / US | 03 /
Kurtz, Andrew Dallas 93 Devonshire Court Somerville New Jersey 08876 / US | [1981/40] | Representative(s) | Lecca, Jean, et al CABINET PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam F-75009 Paris / FR | [1981/40] | Application number, filing date | 81200299.6 | 17.03.1981 | [1981/40] | Priority number, date | US19800135948 | 31.03.1980 Original published format: US 135948 | [1981/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0037141 | Date: | 07.10.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0037141 | Date: | 18.07.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C07D251/32 | [1981/40] | CPC: |
C07D251/32 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/40] | Title | German: | Reinigung von Cyanursäure | [1981/40] | English: | Purification of cyanuric acid | [1981/40] | French: | Purification de l'acide cyanurique | [1981/40] | Examination procedure | 28.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/01] | 12.10.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.05.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.12.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.04.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3172886 [ ]; | US3325493 [ ] (KATSUSABURO SHIMAMURA, et al); | US4029660 [ ] (BERKOWITZ SIDNEY); | US4187376 [ ] (CARLSON RONALD H [US]) |