EP0037153 - Plastics bucket with an integral moulded handle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/40] | Plastics bucket and tool for making the same by injection moulding | ||
[1984/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.1985 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CURVER B.V. Spoorlaan Noord 92 NL-5121 WX Rijen / NL | [1981/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gorissen, Jan Theodoor Proosdijstraat 15 NL-6191 AH Beek (L.) / NL | [1981/40] | Representative(s) | Hoogstraten, Willem Cornelis R., et al DSM Patents & Trademarks Office Geleen Postbus 9 6160 MA Geleen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1981/40] | Hoogstraten, Willem Cornelis Roeland, et al OCTROOIBUREAU DSM Postbus 9 NL-6160 MA Geleen / NL | Application number, filing date | 81200336.6 | 26.03.1981 | [1981/40] | Priority number, date | NL19800001877 | 29.03.1980 Original published format: NL 8001877 | [1981/40] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0037153 | Date: | 07.10.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0037153 | Date: | 23.05.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.1981 | Classification | IPC: | A47J47/18, B65D25/32, B29F1/022 | [1981/40] | CPC: |
B65D25/325 (EP);
A47J47/18 (EP);
B29C45/00 (EP);
B29C45/33 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/40] | Title | German: | Kunststoffeimer mit angespritzten Tragbügeln | [1984/21] | English: | Plastics bucket with an integral moulded handle | [1984/21] | French: | Seau en matière plastique avec anse intégralement moulée | [1984/21] |
Former [1981/40] | Kunststoffeimer und Werkzeug zum Spritzgiessen eines solchen Eimers | ||
Former [1981/40] | Plastics bucket and tool for making the same by injection moulding | ||
Former [1981/40] | Seau en matière plastique et outil pour sa fabrication par moulage par injection | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 12.10.1981 | Examination requested [1981/51] | 11.06.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.10.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.02.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 23.05.1984 | [2007/44] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 23.05.1984 | Documents cited: | Search | FR2224281 [ ] (RUFUSS ETS [LI]); | GB1396330 [ ] (BIBBY ENGS LTD R, et al) |