EP0037157 - Process for removing carbonyl sulfide from gaseous streams [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 13.09.1988 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.1988 | Revocation of patent | published on 02.11.1988 [1988/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/40] | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tellis, Cyril 818 Beaumont Road Charleston West Virginia. 25314 / US | [1981/40] | Representative(s) | Urbanus, Henricus Maria, et al c/o Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 107 2587 BP 's-Gravenhage / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1981/40] | Urbanus, Henricus Maria, Ir., et al c/o Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 107 NL-2587 BP 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 81200344.0 | 27.03.1981 | [1981/40] | Priority number, date | US19800135784 | 31.03.1980 Original published format: US 135784 | [1981/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0037157 | Date: | 07.10.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0037157 | Date: | 09.12.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0037157 | Date: | 13.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/34, C10K1/20 | [1981/49] | CPC: |
B01D53/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1981/40] | B01D53/34 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1981/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Entfernung von COS aus Gasen | [1981/40] | English: | Process for removing carbonyl sulfide from gaseous streams | [1981/40] | French: | Procédé d'élimination de COS de courants gazeux | [1981/40] | Examination procedure | 08.06.1982 | Examination requested [1982/33] | 22.09.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.05.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.07.1986
12.08.1986
ADMISSIBLE Imperial Chemical Industries PLC Legal Department Patents PO Box 6 Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Hertfordshire AL7 1HD / GB Opponent's representative Gratwick, Christopher Uniqema Intellectual Property Department PO Box 90 Wilton Middlesbrough Clveland TS90 8JE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.07.1986
12.08.1986
ADMISSIBLE Imperial Chemical Industries PLC Legal Department Patents PO Box 6 Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Hertfordshire AL7 1HD / GB Opponent's representative Gratwick, Christopher Intellectual Property Department ICI Chemicals & Polymers Ltd P.O. Box 11 The Heath Runcorn Cheshire WA7 4QE / GB | 08.10.1986 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 31.03.1987 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.05.1987 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 24.07.1987 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 17.03.1988 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.05.1988 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 27.05.1988 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1988/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE411389 (BASF AG); | [D]US3441370 (GUTMANN WILLIAM R, et al); | [D]US3492083 (LOWICKI NORBERT, et al); | [A]DE2029074 ; | [D]US4009009 (MASSOTH FRANKLIN E, et al); | [D]DE2650711 (CONOCO METHANATION CO); | [D]US4128619 (ROBINSON VICTOR S) |