EP0039533 - Densitometer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.1986 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REPROTEST B.V. ter Gouwstraat 1 NL-1093 JX Amsterdam / NL | [1984/42] |
Former [1981/45] | For all designated states STICHTING INSTITUUT VOOR GRAFISCHE TECHNIEK TNO Ter Gouwstraat 1 P.O.Box 4150 NL-1009 AD Amsterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van Domselaar, Jan Thorbeckestraat 29 NL-1272 HB Huizen / NL | 02 /
Laane, Albertus Willem Achterwerf 183 NL-1357 BW Almere / NL | [1981/45] | Representative(s) | van der Beek, George F., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS 's-Gravenhage / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1981/45] | van der Beek, George Frans, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 81200471.1 | 01.05.1981 | [1981/45] | Priority number, date | NL19800002565 | 02.05.1980 Original published format: NL 8002565 | [1981/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0039533 | Date: | 11.11.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0039533 | Date: | 10.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1981 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/55 | [1981/45] | CPC: |
G01N21/474 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/45] | Title | German: | Densitometer | [1981/45] | English: | Densitometer | [1981/45] | French: | Densitomètre | [1981/45] | Examination procedure | 08.01.1982 | Examination requested [1982/13] | 28.01.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.10.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.01.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.1983 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.06.1983 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.05.1985 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1246416 (CENTRAL ELECTR GENERAT BOARD [GB]); | US3756725 [ ] (MANRING J); | [A]FR2239675 (KLEIBER HEINZ [DE]) |