EP0042632 - Recording material and method for the production of metal images [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.1983 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert N.V. Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/52] | For all designated states AGFA-GEVAERT naamloze vennootschap Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Laridon, Urbain Leopold Damhertenlaan 36 B-2610 Wilrijk / BE | 02 /
Leenders, Luc Herwig Broekstraat 7 B-2450 Tielen / BE | 03 /
Van den Bogaert, Jan Adrianus De Rest 21 B-2230 Schilde / BE | 04 /
Heylen, Paul Jozef Sporthalplein 95 B-2610 Wilrijk / BE | [1981/52] | Application number, filing date | 81200490.1 | 08.05.1981 | [1981/52] | Priority number, date | GB19800020167 | 20.06.1980 Original published format: GB 8020167 | [1981/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0042632 | Date: | 30.12.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.1981 | Classification | IPC: | G03F1/00, G03F7/10, G03C5/00 | [1981/52] | CPC: |
G03F1/68 (EP);
G03F1/50 (EP);
G03F7/004 (EP);
G03F7/346 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1981/52] | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungsmaterial und Verfahren zur Herstellung von Metallbildern | [1981/52] | English: | Recording material and method for the production of metal images | [1981/52] | French: | Matériel d'enregistrement et méthode pour obtenir des images métalliques | [1981/52] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 01.10.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1983/11] | 13.12.1982 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1983/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [D]DE2716422 ; | DE2824083 [ ]; | GB2020839 [ ]; | GB2020838 [ ]; | GB2020837 [ ]; | GB2020836 [ ]; | US4142898 [ ] (IZU MASATSUGU); | [A]GB1378970 ; | [A]FR2330033 |