EP0042639 - Azido, imido, amido and amino derivatives of mercaptoacyl prolines and pipecolic acids having hypotensive activity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.1985 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.1990 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 27.06.1990 [1990/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E.R. Squibb & Sons, Inc. Lawrenceville-Princeton Road Princeton, N.J. 08540-4000 / US | [1981/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krapcho, John 150 DeMott Lane Somerset New Jersey / US | 02 /
Wade, Peter C. 7873 Kellogg Creek Drive Mentor Ohio / US | 03 /
Petrillo, Edward W., Jr. 433 Sked Street Pennington New Jersey / US | 04 /
Weisenborn, Frank L. 2 Maddock Road Titusville New Jersey / US | [1981/52] | Representative(s) | Maiffret, Bernard, et al Law Offices of William J. Rezac 49, avenue Franklin D. Roosevelt 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/52] | Maiffret, Bernard, et al Law Offices of William J. Rezac 49, avenue Franklin D. Roosevelt F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 81200619.5 | 04.06.1981 | [1981/52] | Priority number, date | US19800162341 | 23.06.1980 Original published format: US 162341 | US19800171565 | 23.07.1980 Original published format: US 171565 | [1981/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0042639 | Date: | 30.12.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0042639 | Date: | 10.02.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0042639 | Date: | 22.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C07D207/16, C07D207/404, C07D207/452, C07D211/60, C07D211/88, C07D401/04, C07D403/04, C07D417/04, // A61K31/40, A61K31/41, A61K31/425, A61K31/445, A61K31/47 | [1982/07] | CPC: |
C07D231/12 (EP);
C07D207/16 (EP);
C07D211/38 (EP);
C07D211/60 (EP);
C07D233/56 (EP);
C07D249/08 (EP);
Y02P20/55 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1982/06] | C07D207/16, C07D207/404, C07D207/452, C07D211/60, C07D211/88, C07D401/04, C07D403/04, // A61K31/40, A61K31/41, A61K31/425, A61K31/445, A61K31/47 | ||
Former IPC [1981/52] | C07D207/16, C07D211/60, C07D401/04, C07D403/04, C07D417/04, // A61K31/40, A61K31/41, A61K31/425, A61K31/445, A61K31/47 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/52] | Title | German: | Azido-, Imido-, Amido- und Aminoderivate von Mercaptoacyl-Prolinen und -Pipecolinsäuren, die eine hypotensive Wirkung aufweisen | [1981/52] | English: | Azido, imido, amido and amino derivatives of mercaptoacyl prolines and pipecolic acids having hypotensive activity | [1981/52] | French: | Dérivés azido, imide, amide et amino de mercaptoacylprolines et d'acides pipécoliques doués d' activité hypotensive | [1981/52] | Examination procedure | 14.06.1982 | Examination requested [1982/34] | 27.05.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 26.01.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.05.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.08.1984 | [1985/25] | Documents cited: | Search | GB2027205 [ ]; | [D]US4105776 ; | US4198515 [ ]; | US4046889 [ ] |