EP0043608 - Hemolytic method for the kinetic determination of antistreptolysin O antibodies in blood or serum samples, using oxidised SO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/02] | Hemolytic method for the continuous determination of antistreptolysin O antibodies in blood or serum samples, using oxidised SO | ||
[1985/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.1986 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.09.1986 [1986/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIESSE DIAGNOSTICA SENESE s.r.l. Via S.Vittore, 36/1 I-20123 Milano / IT | [1982/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ricci, Antonio, Dr. Monteriggioni Località Caggio Risciano (Siena) / IT | [1982/02] | Representative(s) | Giambrocono, Alfonso, et al Giambrocono & C. S.p.A. Via Rosolino Pilo 19/B 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1984/31] | Giambrocono, Alfonso, Dr. Ing., et al Ing. A. Giambrocono & C. S.r.l. Via Rosolino Pilo 19/B I-20129 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1982/02] | Giambrocono, Alfonso, Dr. Ing. Ing. A. Giambrocono & C. s.r.l. Via Rosolino Pilo, 19/b I-20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 81200658.3 | 12.06.1981 | [1982/02] | Priority number, date | IT19800023215 | 03.07.1980 Original published format: IT 2321580 | [1982/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0043608 | Date: | 13.01.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0043608 | Date: | 11.09.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.1981 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/557 | [1985/37] | CPC: |
G01N33/56944 (EP,US);
G01N33/555 (EP,US);
Y10S436/805 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1982/02] | G01N33/54 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/02] | Title | German: | Hämolytisches Verfahren zur kinetischen Bestimmung von Antistreptolysin-O-Antikörpern in Blut- oder Serumproben, unter Anwendung von oxydiertem Streptolysin-O | [1985/37] | English: | Hemolytic method for the kinetic determination of antistreptolysin O antibodies in blood or serum samples, using oxidised SO | [1985/37] | French: | Procédé hémolytique pour la détermination cinétique des anticorps antistreptolysine-O dans les échantillons de sang ou de sérum, utilisant la streptolysine-O oxydée | [1985/37] |
Former [1982/02] | Hämolytisches Verfahren zur kontinuierlichen Bestimmung von Antistreptolysin-O-Antikörpern in Blut- oder Serumproben, unter Anwendung von oxydiertem Streptolysin-O | ||
Former [1982/02] | Hemolytic method for the continuous determination of antistreptolysin O antibodies in blood or serum samples, using oxidised SO | ||
Former [1982/02] | Procédé hémolytique pour la détermination continue des anticorps antistreptolysine-O dans les échantillons de sang ou de sérum, utilisant la streptolysine-O oxydée | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 07.04.1982 | Examination requested [1982/26] | 15.03.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.11.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1914081 (BEHRINGWERKE AG); | [XD]FR2336685 (SCLAVO INST SIEROTERAPEUT [IT]); | [X]FR2435020 (SUOVANIEMI FINNPIPETTE) | [XD] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 89, no. 21, November 20, 1978, page 426, abstract 177775v, Columbus, Ohio, (USA) RICCI A. et al. "New hemolytic method for determination of antistreptolysin 0 in whole blood" & J. CLIN. MICROBIOL. 1978, 8(3), 263-7 | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 73, no. 19, May 8, 1972, page 221, abstract 110038v, Columbus, Ohio, (USA) PALEL G. "Standardization of the thechnique for the determination of 0 antistreptolysin on plastic plates with cups" & SPITALUL 1971, 84(4), 319-26 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 73, no. 1, July 6, 1970, page 174, abstract 2029x, Columbus, Ohio, (USA) BERNHEIMER A.W. et al. "Streptolysin O:activation by thiols" & INFEC. IMMUNITY 1970, 1(5), 509-10. | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 78, no. 11, March 19, 1973, page 306, abstract 69995f Columbus, Ohio, (USA) REGENTOVA Yu.P. "Use of human erythrocytes during the determination of an antistreptolysin-O titer" & LAB. DELO 1972, (11),697 | Examination | - A.L. Lehminzer, Biochemistry (1970) Worth Publishers Inc. New York, page 159 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 73, no. 1, July 6, 1970, page 174, abstract 2029x Columbus, Ohio, USA BERNHEIMER A.W. et al. "Streptolysin 0: activation by thiols" | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 78, no. 11, 3 March 19, 1973, page 306, abstract 69995f Columbus, Ohio, USA REGENTOVA Yu. P. "Use of human erythrocytes during the determination of an antistreptolysin-0 titer" |