EP0045100 - Process for the transformation of an aldehyde into alkene, in particular of furfural into furfurylidenes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.1985 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGRIFURANE S.A. Z.I. de Boé Cidex 4412 F-47240 Bon Encontre / FR | [1982/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Delmas, Michel Rouens F-12140 Entraygues / FR | 02 /
Gaset, Antoine 75, allée de Brienne F-31000 Toulouse / FR | 03 /
Le Bigot, Yves Le Pous F-34380 Saint Martin de Londres / FR | [1982/05] | Representative(s) | Barre, Philippe Cabinet Barre Laforgue et associés 95 rue des Amidonniers 31000 Toulouse / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/05] | Barre, Philippe Cabinet Barre Laforgue et associés 95 rue des Amidonniers F-31000 Toulouse / FR | Application number, filing date | 81200692.2 | 19.06.1981 | [1982/05] | Priority number, date | FR19800016767 | 28.07.1980 Original published format: FR 8016767 | [1982/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0045100 | Date: | 03.02.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0045100 | Date: | 14.03.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C07B27/00, C07D307/36, // C07C43/23, C07C43/215, C07C41/30, C07C15/44, C07C11/02, C07C1/34, C07C79/10, C07C76/02 | [1982/05] | CPC: |
C07D307/36 (EP,US);
C07C1/34 (EP,US);
C07C201/12 (EP,US);
C07C41/30 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C1/34, C07C11/02 (US,EP);
C07C1/34, C07C15/44 (EP,US);
C07C201/12, C07C205/06 (US,EP);
C07C41/30, C07C43/215 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/05] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Umsetzen eines Aldehyds in ein Alken, insbesondere von Furfural in Furfurylidene | [1982/05] | English: | Process for the transformation of an aldehyde into alkene, in particular of furfural into furfurylidenes | [1982/05] | French: | Procédé de transformation d'un aldéhyde en un alcène, en particulier de furfural en furfurylidènes | [1982/05] | Examination procedure | 01.03.1982 | Examination requested [1982/19] | 10.08.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.01.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.08.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.06.1984 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | JP54079203 [ ] | [D] - Tetrahedron Letters, Juillet 1974, No. 30 Pergamon Press, GB TAGAKI, W. et al. "Wittig Reaction in Benzene-Aqueous Alkaline Solution" pages 2587-2590 * whole article * | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 92, No. 1, January 7, 1980 page 569, Abstract 6038q New York, US & JP-A-54 079 203 (Takasago Perfumery Co. Ltd.) (25-06-1979) * whole Abstract *, & JP54079203 A 00000000 | [AD] - Synthesis, Juin 1976 Stuttgart, DE, M. MIKOLAJCZYK et al. "Horner-Wittig Reactions in a Two-Phase System in the Absence of a Typical Phase-Transfer Catalyst" pages 396-398 | [A] - Synthesis, Novembre 1979, Stuttgart, DE F. TEXIER-BOULLET et al. "The Wittig-Horner Reaction in Solid-Liquid Two Phase Systems", pages 884-885. |