EP0044584 - Method of assembling two sections [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/04] | Method of assembling two sections, and wedge for its application | ||
[1984/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.1985 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.1990 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 27.06.1990 [1990/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TECHNAL INTERNATIONAL S.A. 254 rue Léon Joulin 31024 Toulouse Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/04] | For all designated states TECHNAL INTERNATIONAL S.A. 254 rue Léon Joulin F-31024 Toulouse Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Laugier, Yves Dominique 46 rue du Canon d'Arcole F-31000 Toulouse / FR | [1982/04] | Representative(s) | Barre, Philippe Cabinet Barre Laforgue et associés 95 rue des Amidonniers 31000 Toulouse / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/04] | Barre, Philippe Cabinet Barre Laforgue et associés 95 rue des Amidonniers F-31000 Toulouse / FR | Application number, filing date | 81200740.9 | 30.06.1981 | [1982/04] | Priority number, date | FR19800016083 | 21.07.1980 Original published format: FR 8016083 | [1982/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0044584 | Date: | 27.01.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0044584 | Date: | 27.06.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.1981 | Classification | IPC: | E04F11/18, F16B2/18 | [1982/04] | CPC: |
E04F11/1836 (EP,US);
F16B7/00 (KR);
F16B2/18 (EP,US);
F16B2200/20 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49954 (EP,US);
Y10T403/7075 (EP,US);
Y10T403/76 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/04] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Verbinden zweier Profile | [1984/26] | English: | Method of assembling two sections | [1984/26] | French: | Procédé d'assemblage de deux profilés | [1984/26] |
Former [1982/04] | Verfahren zum Verbinden zweier Profile und Keil für ihre Anwendung | ||
Former [1982/04] | Method of assembling two sections, and wedge for its application | ||
Former [1982/04] | Procédé d'assemblage de deux profilés et clavette pour sa mise en oeuvre | Examination procedure | 08.03.1982 | Examination requested [1982/20] | 23.06.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.12.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.03.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB484422 (EMILE DAMOND); | [D]FR2128366 (ALCAN RES & DEV); | [D]FR2268920 (TECHNAL INTERNATIONAL SA [FR]) |