EP0044117 - Catalyst [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.1987 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.1990 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 18.07.1990 [1990/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DYSON REFRACTORIES LIMITED 381 Fulwood Road Sheffield, S1O 3GB / GB | [1982/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sambrook, Rodney Martin 31 Gainsborough Road Dronfield Sheffield, S18 6QT / GB | 02 /
Huxham Ross, Julian Richard 15 Sherwood Avenue Gomersal Cleckheaton, BD19 4RW / GB | [1982/03] | Representative(s) | Shaw, Laurence, et al 5th Floor, Metropolitan House, 1 Hagley Road, Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8TG / GB | [1983/41] |
Former [1982/03] | Houghton, David Hulse & Co. Eagle Star House, Carver Street Sheffield S1 4FP / GB | Application number, filing date | 81200799.5 | 13.07.1981 | [1982/03] | Priority number, date | GB19800023225 | 16.07.1980 Original published format: GB 8023225 | [1982/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0044117 | Date: | 20.01.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0044117 | Date: | 27.01.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0044117 | Date: | 03.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/76, B01J37/00 | [1982/03] | CPC: |
B01J37/03 (EP,US);
B01J23/78 (EP,US);
B01J23/83 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/03] | Title | German: | Katalysator | [1982/03] | English: | Catalyst | [1982/03] | French: | Catalyseur | [1982/03] | Examination procedure | 24.05.1982 | Examination requested [1982/45] | 25.05.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 25.10.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.12.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4215998 [ ] (FUTAMI HIDEO [JP]); | GB1336866 [ ] (KYOWA CHEM IND CO LTD); | GB1220105 [ ] (STAMICARBON [NL]); | US2695893 [ ] (HOUDRY EUGENE J) | Examination | GB1056685 | US3394086 | DE740634 |