EP0048049 - Method of operating heat exchanger apparatus comprising a plurality of heat exchanger units connected in series [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/12] | Method of operating heat exchanger apparatus comprising a plurality of heat exchanger units connected in series, and apparatus adapted for operation by the method | ||
[1984/05] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.1984 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.02.1985 [1985/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ESMIL B.V. De Boelelaan 7 P.O. Box 7811 NL-1008 AA Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1982/12] | For all designated states ESMIL B.V. De Boelelaan 7 P.O. Box 7811 NL-1008 AA Amsterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klaren, Dick Gerrit Rubenplantsoen 2 Hillegom / NL | [1982/12] | Representative(s) | Zuidema, Bert, et al p/a HOOGOVENS GROEP B.V. P.O. Box 10.000 1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1982/12] | Zuidema, Bert, Ir., et al p/a HOOGOVENS GROEP B.V. P.O. Box 10.000 NL-1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | Application number, filing date | 81200948.8 | 27.08.1981 | [1982/12] | Priority number, date | NL19800005023 | 05.09.1980 Original published format: NL 8005023 | [1982/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0048049 | Date: | 24.03.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0048049 | Date: | 01.02.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.1982 | Classification | IPC: | F28G1/12, F28G13/00 | [1982/12] | CPC: |
F28G1/12 (EP,US);
F28D13/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1982/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Betrieb von Wärmetauschern mit mehreren in Serie geschalteten Wärmetauschereinheiten | [1984/05] | English: | Method of operating heat exchanger apparatus comprising a plurality of heat exchanger units connected in series | [1984/05] | French: | Méthode d'opération d'un échangeur de chaleur comportant plusieurs unités d'échangeurs de chaleur montées en série | [1984/05] |
Former [1982/12] | Betriebsverfahren von Wärmetauschern mit mehreren in Serie geschalteten Wärmetauschereinheiten und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | ||
Former [1982/12] | Method of operating heat exchanger apparatus comprising a plurality of heat exchanger units connected in series, and apparatus adapted for operation by the method | ||
Former [1982/12] | Méthode d'opération d'un échangeur de chaleur comportant plusieurs échangeurs de chaleur en série, et dispositif pour appliquer cette méthode | Examination procedure | 27.08.1981 | Examination requested [1982/12] | 23.06.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.07.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3269457 (REUEL SHINNAR); | US3319704 [ ] (HANS NASSE); | DE2414768 [ ] (JANICH HANS JUERGEN); | [A]DE2541902 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]DE2502354 (WOLGOGRADSKIJ POLITEKHN I SSR); | FR2312005 [ ] (PIEPER GUSTAV [NL]); | [D]FR2387431 (ESMIL BV [NL]) |