Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE17254T | 15.01.1986 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP81200998 | 09.09.1981 | NL8005110 | 11.09.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0048059 | Global Dossier | 02.01.1986 | B1 | EP0048059 | 24.03.1982 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NL8005110 | 11.09.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3173377D1 | 13.02.1986 | D1 | Priority number | Date | NL8005110 | 11.09.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK397681 | 12.03.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | NL8005110 | 11.09.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES8302750 | 01.12.1982 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NL8005110 | 11.09.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI73705C | 09.11.1987 | C | FI73705B | 31.07.1987 | B | FI812818L | 12.03.1982 | L | Priority number | Date | NL8005110 | 11.09.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS6036220B | 19.08.1985 | B2 | JPS5780446 | 20.05.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | NL8005110 | 11.09.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO161624C | 06.09.1989 | C | NO161624B | 29.05.1989 | B | NO813089L | 12.03.1982 | L | Priority number | Date | NL8005110 | 11.09.1980 |