EP0048059 - Polymer composition of graft copolymers of styrene and acrylonitrile on a rubber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/12] | Polymer composition | ||
[1986/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.10.1986 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.1987 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.05.1987 [1987/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STAMICARBON B.V. Mijnweg 1 NL-6167 AC Geleen / NL | [1982/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Bokhoven, Petrus Hubertus Maria Steinhartstraat 9 NL-6174 RH Sweikhuizen / NL | 02 /
Van der Loos, Jozef Lambertus Maria Rijksweg Zuid 146 NL-6134 AE Sittard / NL | 03 /
Tijssen, Jan Alexanderstraat 40 NL-6176 BR Spaubeek / NL | 04 /
Hoen, Johannes Gerardus Prevotlaan 9 NL-6132 BM Sittard / NL | [1982/12] | Representative(s) | Hoogstraten, Willem Cornelis R., et al DSM Patents & Trademarks Office Geleen Postbus 9 6160 MA Geleen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1986/41] | Hoogstraten, Willem Cornelis Roeland, et al OCTROOIBUREAU DSM Postbus 9 NL-6160 MA Geleen / NL | ||
Former [1982/12] | Hatzmann, Marinus Jan OCTROOIBUREAU DSM P.O.Box 9 NL-6160 MA Geleen / NL | Application number, filing date | 81200998.3 | 09.09.1981 | [1982/12] | Priority number, date | NL19800005110 | 11.09.1980 Original published format: NL 8005110 | [1982/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0048059 | Date: | 24.03.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0048059 | Date: | 02.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C08L55/02, C08L51/04, C08L25/12, C08L25/16 | [1982/12] | CPC: |
C08L25/16 (EP);
C08L51/04 (EP);
C08L55/02 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L25/16, C08L2666/24 (EP);
C08L51/04, C08L2666/02 (EP);
C08L55/02, C08L2666/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/23] |
Former [1982/12] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Polymerzusammensetzung von Pfropfcopolymeren aus Styrol und Acrylnitril gepfropft auf Kautschuk | [1986/01] | English: | Polymer composition of graft copolymers of styrene and acrylonitrile on a rubber | [1986/01] | French: | Composition polymère des polymères greffés de styrene et d'acrylonitrile sur un caoutchouc | [1986/01] |
Former [1982/12] | Polymerzusammensetzung | ||
Former [1982/12] | Polymer composition | ||
Former [1982/12] | Composition polymère | Examination procedure | 09.09.1981 | Examination requested [1982/12] | 05.01.1982 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) LU | 16.03.1982 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.05.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.06.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.05.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.10.1981 | LU   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.01.1986 | [1987/20] | Documents cited: | Search | FR2268832 [ ] (BAYER AG [DE]); | FR2268833 [ ] (BAYER AG [DE]); | US3928494 [ ] (ALIBERTI VINCENT A) | Examination | EP0044101 |