EP0074437 - Artificial thatch roof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.1985 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.1985 [1985/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kerkhoff, W.H.C., Dr. Torenlaan 70 NL-1261 GG Blaricum / NL | [1983/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1983/12] | Application number, filing date | 81201020.5 | 11.09.1981 | [1983/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0074437 | Date: | 23.03.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.1982 | Classification | IPC: | E04D9/00, E04D3/35 | [1983/12] | CPC: |
E04D3/35 (EP);
E04D9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/12] | Title | German: | Artifizielle Reetdacheindeckung | [1983/12] | English: | Artificial thatch roof | [1983/12] | French: | Couverture de paille artificielle | [1983/12] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 13.12.1982 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, IT, LU, SE | 24.02.1983 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.09.1983 | Examination requested [1983/48] | 23.05.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/40] | 22.04.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1985/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.09.1982 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 13.09.1982 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 13.09.1982 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 13.09.1982 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 13.09.1982 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 13.09.1982 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1983 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 01.10.1984 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB2052599 [ ]; | AU20566 [ ]; | DE1943559 [ ]; | FR2176311 [ ] |