EP0048531 - Device for measuring pressure at hardly accessible places [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.1985 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states METABO S.A. Construction d'appareils scientifiques et médicaux CH-1066 Epalinges / CH | [1982/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Favre, Robert 5, chemin du Levant CH-1005 Lausanne / CH | [1982/13] | Representative(s) | Meylan, Robert Maurice c/o Bugnion SA Conseils en Propriété Industrielle 10, Route de Florissant Case Postale 375 1211 Genève 12 - Champel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1982/13] | Meylan, Robert Maurice c/o Bugnion SA Conseils en Propriété Industrielle 10, Route de Florissant Case Postale 375 CH-1211 Genève 12 - Champel / CH | Application number, filing date | 81201059.3 | 23.09.1981 | [1982/13] | Priority number, date | CH19800007134 | 24.09.1980 Original published format: CH 713480 | [1982/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0048531 | Date: | 31.03.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0048531 | Date: | 04.07.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G01L11/00, A61B5/02 | [1982/13] | CPC: |
G01L11/00 (EP);
A61B5/03 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1982/13] | Title | German: | Druckmessvorrichtung für wenig zugängliche Stellen | [1982/13] | English: | Device for measuring pressure at hardly accessible places | [1982/13] | French: | Dispositif de mesure de pressions en des endroits peu accessibles | [1982/13] | Examination procedure | 01.04.1982 | Examination requested [1982/25] | 26.05.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.12.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.09.1984 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | DE1713296 [ ]; | US3099262 [ ] (BIGLIANO ROBERT P); | FR1561748 [ ]; | DE1648433 [ ] (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG); | DE2027071 [ ]; | DE2811859 [ ] (SIEMENS AG); | DE2816186 [ ] (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM) | Examination | DE1773296 |