EP0049928 - Water soluble derivatives of cephalexin and process for their preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 18.10.1989 [1989/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MIBA Spa Via Falzarego 8 I-20021 Ospiate di Bollate (Milano) / IT | For all designated states Crinos Industria Farmacobiologica S.p.A. Piazza XX Settembre, n. 2 I-22079 Villa Guardia Como / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/12] | For all designated states MIBA Spa Via Falzarego 8 I-20021 Ospiate di Bollate (Milano) / IT | ||
For all designated states Crinos Industria Farmacobiologica S.p.A. Piazza XX Settembre, n. 2 I-22079 Villa Guardia Como / IT | |||
Former [1982/16] | For all designated states NEOPHARMED S.p.A. Via Pordoi, 18 I-20021 Baranzate di Bollate Milano / IT | ||
For all designated states Crinos Industria Farmacobiologica S.p.A. Piazza XX Settembre, n. 2 I-22079 Villa Guardia Como / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reiner, Alberto Via Mentana, 23 Como / IT | [1982/16] | Representative(s) | Dragotti, Gianfranco, et al Dragotti & Associati Srl Via Nino Bixio, 7 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/12] | Dragotti, Gianfranco, et al SAIC BREVETTI s.r.l. Galleria San Babila, 4/D I-20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1982/16] | Dragotti, Gianfranco SAIC BREVETTI s.r.l. Galleria San Babila, 4/D I-20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 81201107.0 | 06.10.1981 | [1982/16] | Priority number, date | IT19800025267 | 13.10.1980 Original published format: IT 2526780 | [1982/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0049928 | Date: | 21.04.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0049928 | Date: | 06.04.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0049928 | Date: | 20.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C07D501/22 | [1982/16] | CPC: |
C07D501/22 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/545 (KR);
A61P31/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, GB, LI, NL, SE [1982/16] | Title | German: | Wasserlösliche Cephalexinderivate und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1982/16] | English: | Water soluble derivatives of cephalexin and process for their preparation | [1982/16] | French: | Dérivés de céphalexine soluble dans l'eau et procédé pour leur préparation | [1982/16] | File destroyed: | 12.07.1996 | Examination procedure | 26.10.1982 | Examination requested [1983/04] | 09.05.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.08.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 28.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.02.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.07.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.11.1987 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   23.03.1988 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.07.1988 | NL | 20.07.1988 | SE | 20.07.1988 | GB | 06.10.1988 | [1989/42] |
Former [1989/24] | AT | 20.07.1988 | |
NL | 20.07.1988 | ||
SE | 20.07.1988 | ||
Former [1989/13] | AT | 20.07.1988 | |
NL | 20.07.1988 | ||
Former [1989/11] | NL | 20.07.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2162198 (BRISTOL MYERS CO) |