Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0049552
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
12.11.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] |
31.10.1991 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.1991 [1991/51] |
31.03.1989 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.05.1989 [1989/20] |
10.02.1986 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 02.04.1986 [1986/14] |
09.02.1985 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 10.04.1985 [1985/15] |
07.06.1982 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.08.1982 [1982/32] |
13.02.1982 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.04.1982 [1982/15] |