Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE12618T | 15.04.1985 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP81201117 | 08.10.1981 | NL8005571 | 08.10.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0049552 | Global Dossier | 10.04.1985 | B1 | EP0049552 | 14.04.1982 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NL8005571 | 08.10.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3169857D1 | 15.05.1985 | D1 | Priority number | Date | NL8005571 | 08.10.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NL8005571 | 03.05.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | NL8005571 | 08.10.1980 |