EP0077418 - Bracelet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.1985 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUMOREX S.A. Rue du Coteau, 19 CH-2503 Bienne / CH | [1983/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moret, André Chemin des Epinettes, 4 CH-2520 La Neuveville / CH | [1983/17] | Representative(s) | Moinas, Michel Moinas & Savoye S.A. Rue Plantamour 42 1201 Genève / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Moinas, Michel Moinas & Savoye S.A. Rue Plantamour 42 1201 Genève / CH | ||
Former [1983/52] | Moinas, Michel Moinas & Cie 42, rue Plantamour CH-1201 Genève / CH | ||
Former [1983/17] | Moinas, Michel Moinas & Cie 42, rue Plantamour CH-1201 Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 81201134.4 | 12.10.1981 | [1983/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0077418 | Date: | 27.04.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.1982 | Classification | IPC: | A44C5/00, A44C5/20, A44C5/24 | [1983/17] | CPC: |
A44C5/246 (EP);
A44C5/0053 (EP);
A44C5/185 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1983/17] | Title | German: | Armband | [1983/17] | English: | Bracelet | [1983/17] | French: | Bracelet | [1983/17] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 15.10.1983 | Examination requested [1984/01] | 16.11.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/40] | 24.04.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1985/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1540754 ; | [A]FR1560424 ; | [A]CH410496 ; | [A]US4288892 ; | [A]US2888729 ; | [A]US3404440 ; | [A]CH485442 ; | [A]GB659267 |