EP0046626 - Substituted benzenesulfonyl isocyanates and preparation thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.12.1984 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.02.1985 [1985/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/09] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Levitt, George 3218 Romilly Road Cardiff Wilmington Delaware 19810 / US | [1982/09] | Representative(s) | Hildyard, Edward Martin, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/09] | Hildyard, Edward Martin, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. European Patent Attorneys Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 81201218.5 | 29.05.1979 | [1982/09] | Priority number, date | US19780910965 | 30.05.1978 Original published format: US 910965 | US19780965070 | 30.11.1978 Original published format: US 965070 | US19790015341 | 01.03.1979 Original published format: US 15341 | US19790029281 | 13.04.1979 Original published format: US 29281 | [1982/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0046626 | Date: | 03.03.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0046626 | Date: | 17.03.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0046626 | Date: | 08.02.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C07C143/828 | [1982/09] | CPC: |
C07C311/65 (EP,US);
A01N47/28 (EP);
A01N47/36 (EP);
C07C317/00 (EP);
C07C323/00 (EP);
C07D239/42 (EP);
C07D239/46 (EP);
C07D239/47 (EP);
C07D239/48 (EP);
C07D239/52 (EP);
C07D251/14 (EP);
C07D251/16 (EP);
C07D251/18 (EP);
C07D251/46 (EP);
C07D251/52 (EP);
C07D253/06 (EP);
C07D253/07 (EP);
C07D253/075 (EP);
C07D521/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1982/09] | Title | German: | Substituierte Benzensulfonyl-isocyanate und deren Herstellung | [1982/09] | English: | Substituted benzenesulfonyl isocyanates and preparation thereof | [1982/09] | French: | Isocyanates de benzènesulfonyl substitués et leur préparation | [1982/09] | Examination procedure | 15.01.1982 | Examination requested [1982/14] | 08.09.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 24.01.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.07.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP79300982.0 / EP0007687 | Opposition(s) | 09.11.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - Arzneimittel-Forschung, Vol. 22, No. 12a, December 1972, Edition Cantor KG Aulendorf (DE) F. BIGLER et al.: "Uber den Stoffwechsel von Glibornurid Beim Menschen" pages 2191-2198 |